LA HCR102 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the request by the secretary of the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries to the U.S. Secretary of Commerce to declare a fisheries disaster in the state of Louisiana
Title
Expresses support for the request by the secretary of the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries to the U.S. Secretary of Commerce to declare a fisheries disaster in the state of Louisiana
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Amedee [R] | Rep. Robert Billiot [D] | Sen. Norby Chabert [R] | Rep. Gordon Dove [R] |
Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D] | Rep. Joseph Harrison [R] | Rep. Reed Henderson [D] | Rep. Karen St Germain [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 102, ADOPT (#260) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-05-31 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-05-24 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-16 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2011-05-16 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |