LA HCR101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Louisiana Commission on Civil Asset Forfeiture

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Louisiana Commission on Civil Asset Forfeiture

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-29HouseReported with amendments (11-0-1) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback