LA HCR101 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the printing of certain constitutional provisions regarding disqualification from holding elective office that were unconstitutionally adopted
Title
Provides relative to the printing of certain constitutional provisions regarding disqualification from holding elective office that were unconstitutionally adopted
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 101 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1245) (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 71, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |