LA HCR10 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections to review eligibility requirements of its rehabilitative programs to determine whether adequate rehabilitative programs are available to every offender in its custody
Title
Requests the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections to review eligibility requirements of its rehabilitative programs to determine whether adequate rehabilitative programs are available to every offender in its custody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 10 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#440) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 86, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2018-03-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |