LA HCR10 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the town of Welsh as the Home of the Cajun Dictionary
Title
Designates the town of Welsh as the Home of the Cajun Dictionary
Sponsors
Rep. John Guinn [R] | Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 10 ADOPT (#593) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Vote on HCR 10 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#264) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Vote on HCR 10 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#264) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2016. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2016-03-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |