LA HCR1 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends provisions of law authorizing the exclusion of unimmunized persons from in-person attendance at schools and day care centers under certain circumstances
Title
Suspends provisions of law authorizing the exclusion of unimmunized persons from in-person attendance at schools and day care centers under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#849) (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 3 minute rule (#848) (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 1 3 minute rule (#848) (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 61, nays 29. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (7-2). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-01-21 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/21/2022. |
2022-01-18 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |