LA HB99 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for fees in certain civil matters (EG INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for fees in certain civil matters (EG INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 99 FINAL PASSAGE (#571) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 41. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2017-05-31 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (10-4). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2017-03-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2017-03-23 | House | Prefiled. |