LA HB98 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the provision tying the Oil Field Site Restoration Fund fee to the payment of severance tax (EN +$1,400,000 SD RV See Note)
Title
Repeals the provision tying the Oil Field Site Restoration Fund fee to the payment of severance tax (EN +$1,400,000 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 98 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#821) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 98 FINAL PASSAGE (#790) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 98 FINAL PASSAGE (#134) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 98 FINAL PASSAGE (#790) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 98 FINAL PASSAGE (#134) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Effective date: 07/01/17. |
2017-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 411. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-23 | House | Prefiled. |