LA HB979 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Becomes HB 1161.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Becomes HB 1161.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to functions and composition of the La. State Board of Nursing (OR SEE FISC NOTE SG RV)
Title
Provides relative to functions and composition of the La. State Board of Nursing (OR SEE FISC NOTE SG RV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Becomes HB 1161. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported by substitute (10-0). |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read by title. |