LA HB978 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 83 yeas, 14 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 83 yeas, 14 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to prohibition on certain governmental entity contracts with companies that discriminate against firearm and ammunition industries (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to prohibition on certain governmental entity contracts with companies that discriminate against firearm and ammunition industries (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 978 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1511) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 978 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1511) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 978 FINAL PASSAGE (#732) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 978 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1511) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 978 FINAL PASSAGE (#732) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-05 | House | By a vote of 83 yeas, 14 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (17-3). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |