LA HB978 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-05 - Effective date: 06/05/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-05 - Effective date: 06/05/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for administration, disposition, enforcement, and adjudication of state and local taxes under the jurisdiction of the Board of Tax Appeals (EN -$32,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for administration, disposition, enforcement, and adjudication of state and local taxes under the jurisdiction of the Board of Tax Appeals (EN -$32,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 978 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#993) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 978 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 978 FINAL PASSAGE (#398) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 978 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 978 FINAL PASSAGE (#398) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-05 | House | Effective date: 06/05/2016. |
2016-06-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 335. |
2016-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-26 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-24 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016. |
2016-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016. |
2016-04-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read by title. |