LA HB97 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the secretary of the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to designate a proxy to serve in his stead on the Louisiana Forestry Commission
Title
Allows the secretary of the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to designate a proxy to serve in his stead on the Louisiana Forestry Commission
Sponsors
Rep. John Anders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2019-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. |
2019-03-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2019-03-21 | House | Prefiled. |