LA HB97 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows driving schools to provide classroom instruction to persons ninety days before their fifteenth birthday
Title
Allows driving schools to provide classroom instruction to persons ninety days before their fifteenth birthday
Sponsors
Rep. James Armes [D] | Rep. Robert Billiot [D] | Rep. Henry Burns [R] | Sen. Patrick Cortez [R] |
Rep. Herbert Dixon [D] | Rep. Jean Doerge [D] | Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D] | Rep. Sam Jones [D] |
Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 97, FINAL PASSAGE (#1112) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 97, FINAL PASSAGE (#10) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 97, FINAL PASSAGE (#10) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 227. | |
2010-06-09 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-25 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-24 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-06 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-04-05 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 5, 2010. | |
2010-03-31 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported favorably (16-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |