LA HB964 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the merger of Louisiana Tech and LSU-Shreveport (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the merger of Louisiana Tech and LSU-Shreveport (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-08 | Reported with amendments (14-4) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. |