LA HB96 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to sharing of student information for the purpose of administering the pandemic electronic benefits transfer (P-EBT) program (Item #28)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to sharing of student information for the purpose of administering the pandemic electronic benefits transfer (P-EBT) program (Item #28)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 96 ADOPT (#232) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-23 - House - House Vote on HB 96 MOTION TO ADOPT (#268) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on HB 96 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#231) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 96 FINAL PASSAGE (#171) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on HB 96 FINAL PASSAGE (#149) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-05HouseEffective date: See Act.
2020-11-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 49.
2020-10-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-10-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-10-23HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-23HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-10-23SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-10-23SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays.
2020-10-23SenateConference committee report received.
2020-10-23HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-10-23HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-23HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2020-10-23SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-10-23HouseHouse conferees appointed: Freeman, Garofalo, and Hilferty.
2020-10-22SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Talbot, and Mizell.
2020-10-22HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-10-22SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-10-21HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 6, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-10-21HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-21HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-10-21SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-20SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-15SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-10-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20.
2020-10-14HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-14HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-14HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2020-10-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB96&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191819
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192525
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194466
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1195052
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192391
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192363
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193339
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193932
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193961
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191820
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192657
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192840
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193918
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194444
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194451

Bill Comments

feedback