LA HB96 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the creation of judicial nominating commissions for the merit selection of judges
Title
Provides for the creation of judicial nominating commissions for the merit selection of judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-18 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-18 | House | Prefiled. |