LA HB96 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional amendment) Removes the mandatory retirement age of judges (EN DECREASE FC SG EX)
Title
(Constitutional amendment) Removes the mandatory retirement age of judges (EN DECREASE FC SG EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 96 FINAL PASSAGE (#1441) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 96 FINAL PASSAGE (#632) (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 96 FINAL PASSAGE (#632) (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2014-06-23 | House | Becomes Act No. 875. |
2014-06-11 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 19. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014. |
2014-04-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported without amendments (11-0). |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported favorably (12-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-02-07 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/7/2014. |
2014-01-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-01-31 | House | Prefiled. |