LA HB947 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain state entities to report to the legislature information concerning administration of the entities
Title
Requires certain state entities to report to the legislature information concerning administration of the entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 947 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1233) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 947 FINAL PASSAGE (#1138) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 947 FINAL PASSAGE (#419) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 947 FINAL PASSAGE (#1138) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 947 FINAL PASSAGE (#419) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 557. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2016. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2016-03-31 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-30 | House | Read by title. |