LA HB936 | 2016 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB329
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to entities authorized to provide services related to motor vehicles (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to entities authorized to provide services related to motor vehicles (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 936 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1196) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 936 FINAL PASSAGE (#984) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Vote on HB 936 FINAL PASSAGE (#225) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 936 FINAL PASSAGE (#984) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Vote on HB 936 FINAL PASSAGE (#225) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 06/17/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 556. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016. |
2016-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2016-03-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 329 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (14-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB329 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Becomes HB 936.