LA HB935 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 01/01/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 01/01/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to notice to policyholders of policy changes at renewal
Title
Provides relative to notice to policyholders of policy changes at renewal
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Hollis [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 935 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1342) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 935 ADOPT (#1351) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 935 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1142) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 935 FINAL PASSAGE (#935) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 935 FINAL PASSAGE (#692) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 935 ADOPT (#1351) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 935 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1142) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 935 FINAL PASSAGE (#935) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 935 FINAL PASSAGE (#692) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2017. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 596. |
2016-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016. |
2016-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2016-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Johns, John Smith, and Ward. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Hollis, Talbot, and Thibaut. |
2016-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2016-03-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2016-03-29 | House | Read by title. |