LA HB93 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to continuances in workers' compensation cases
Title
Provides relative to continuances in workers' compensation cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 93 FINAL PASSAGE (#1461) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 93 2/3 vote (#1460) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 93 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1526) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 93 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 93 2/3 vote (#1460) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 93 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1526) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 93 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 435. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 32 yeas 0 nays. |
2022-06-05 | House | By a vote of 97 yeas, 3 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-02-18 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. |
2022-02-17 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-02-17 | House | Prefiled. |