LA HB93 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: 06/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: 06/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative the composition of the election sections of the Second District of the Third Circuit Court of Appeal
Title
Provides relative the composition of the election sections of the Second District of the Third Circuit Court of Appeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 93 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#668) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 93 FINAL PASSAGE (#405) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 93 FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 93 FINAL PASSAGE (#405) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 93 FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | House | Effective date: 06/13/2020. |
2020-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 338. |
2020-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-05-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (11-3-1). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-18 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-18 | House | Prefiled. |