LA HB921 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to adverse childhood experiences and trauma-informed education (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to adverse childhood experiences and trauma-informed education (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 921 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1565) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 921 FINAL PASSAGE (#1127) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 921 FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 921 FINAL PASSAGE (#1127) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 921 FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 563. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2022. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |