LA HB913 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 42, nays 54. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 42, nays 54. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to elections for riverboat gaming
Title
Provides relative to elections for riverboat gaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 913 FINAL PASSAGE (#819) (Y: 42 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 42, nays 54. Failed to pass. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |