LA HB91 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to testimony presented by audio-visual means
Title
Provides relative to testimony presented by audio-visual means
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 91 FINAL PASSAGE (#361) (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Notice given. |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-03-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2022. |
2022-03-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported favorably (11-0-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-02-18 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. |
2022-02-17 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-02-17 | House | Prefiled. |