LA HB91 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 11 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 11 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the designated gaming area and the conducting of gaming tournaments at live horse racing facilities (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to the designated gaming area and the conducting of gaming tournaments at live horse racing facilities (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 91 FINAL PASSAGE (#965) (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 91 FINAL PASSAGE (#931) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 91 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 91 FINAL PASSAGE (#931) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 91 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 11 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 13 nays. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. |
2018-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |