LA HB907 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-03 - Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-03 - Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the earnings allowed in the Teachers' Retirement System of La. for retirees who are reemployed as substitute classroom teachers to fill certain vacancies (EGF INCREASE APV)
Title
Increases the earnings allowed in the Teachers' Retirement System of La. for retirees who are reemployed as substitute classroom teachers to fill certain vacancies (EGF INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 907 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1281) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 907 FINAL PASSAGE (#1246) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 907 FINAL PASSAGE (#632) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 907 FINAL PASSAGE (#1246) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 907 FINAL PASSAGE (#632) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Cortez, and Morrish. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-06-03 | House | House conferees appointed: LeBas, Pearson, and Hoffmann. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016. |
2016-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2016-03-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-03-15 | House | Read by title. |