LA HB90 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain legislative committees to approve line of credit recommendations for nonstate entity projects (EG NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires certain legislative committees to approve line of credit recommendations for nonstate entity projects (EG NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#31) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 42. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18. |
2018-03-14 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. |
2018-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |