LA HB9 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts the Omnibus Premium Reduction Act of 2020 (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the Omnibus Premium Reduction Act of 2020 (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported with amendments (11-5).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-01-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/24/2020.
2020-01-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-01-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB9&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1151670
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171741
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1165673
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169471
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1166126
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171013
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171713
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172188
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173790
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174631
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174643
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1151671
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171240
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171782
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174377

Bill Comments

feedback