LA HB898 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for disclosure of contributions and expenditures for electioneering communications
Title
Provides for disclosure of contributions and expenditures for electioneering communications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 898 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1671) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 898 FINAL PASSAGE (#1317) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 898 FINAL PASSAGE (#790) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 898 FINAL PASSAGE (#1317) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 898 FINAL PASSAGE (#790) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |