LA HB898 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB511

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-02 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to threats of violence or terrorism at elementary and secondary schools, including investigation and reporting thereof and required mental health evaluations (EN INCREASE EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to threats of violence or terrorism at elementary and secondary schools, including investigation and reporting thereof and required mental health evaluations (EN INCREASE EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 898 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1326) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 898 FINAL PASSAGE (#1205) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 898 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 898 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-02HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-06-02HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 716.
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
2018-05-16HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-16SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-11SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-11SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-10SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-25HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18.
2018-04-16HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-13HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 511 reported by the Committee on Education (12-0).

Same As/Similar To

HB511 (Replaces) 2018-04-13 - Becomes HB 898.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB898&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086245
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086320
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090165
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099223
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103844
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086552
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088781
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095368
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096814
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096646
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098540
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098936
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086407
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086453
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086248
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086337
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090301
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092186
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095563
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096214
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100732
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1106584
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090106
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098024
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103778

Bill Comments

feedback