LA HB896 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 05/16/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 05/16/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of photo speed enforcement devices on interstates
Title
Prohibits the use of photo speed enforcement devices on interstates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 896 FINAL PASSAGE (#630) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Vote on HB 896 FINAL PASSAGE (#193) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Vote on HB 896 FINAL PASSAGE (#193) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date: 05/16/2014. |
2014-05-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 95. |
2014-05-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014. |
2014-03-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |