LA HB89 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-30-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Renames the Northwest La. Technical College as the Northwest Louisiana Technical Community College and provides for an expansion of its mission and educational program (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renames the Northwest La. Technical College as the Northwest Louisiana Technical Community College and provides for an expansion of its mission and educational program (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]
Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]
Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]
Rep. Franklin Foil [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]
Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]
Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]
Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Terry Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]
Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]
Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]
Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]
Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]
Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]
Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. James Fannin [R]
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]
Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]
Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 89 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#636) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 89 CO-AUTHORS (#415) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 89 FINAL PASSAGE (#414) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 89 FINAL PASSAGE (#103) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseEffective date: 08/01/19.
2019-06-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 287.
2019-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19.
2019-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-14SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-02SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably (8-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-19HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-19HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB89&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116147
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126936
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129262
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139264
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144130
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127283
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128218
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135643
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136055
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137556
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139075
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116156
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125461
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127151
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127405
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129366
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132945
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141503
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129170
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135794
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135795

Bill Comments

feedback