LA HB880 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 07/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 07/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Lafourche Parish School Board to levy and collect an additional sales and use tax (EN +$13,000,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes the Lafourche Parish School Board to levy and collect an additional sales and use tax (EN +$13,000,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 880 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1341) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 880 ADOPT (#1350) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 880 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1240) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 880 FINAL PASSAGE (#1211) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 880 FINAL PASSAGE (#897) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 880 ADOPT (#1350) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 880 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1240) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 880 FINAL PASSAGE (#1211) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 880 FINAL PASSAGE (#897) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 555. |
2016-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays. |
2016-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016. |
2016-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2016-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Brown, Morrell, and Chabert. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Richard, Nancy Landry, and Gisclair. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016. |
2016-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2016. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read by title. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |