LA HB871 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB391

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Revises the definition of dyslexia for purposes of testing and providing services to students (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises the definition of dyslexia for purposes of testing and providing services to students (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 871 FINAL PASSAGE (#713) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 871 2/3 vote (#712) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 871 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#737) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 871 FINAL PASSAGE (#329) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 871 FINAL PASSAGE (#329) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 206.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-06-01SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-01HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-06-01SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31HouseBy a vote of 94 yeas, 1 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 391 reported by the Committee on Education (13-0).

Same As/Similar To

HB391 (Replaces) 2020-05-15 - Becomes HB 871.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB871&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172511
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172548
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179041
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181940
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172512
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172624
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173607
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179341
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185873
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175378
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175750
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178485
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178893

Bill Comments

feedback