LA HB865 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the Capital Area Transit System, to provide for membership, qualifications, procedure for appointment, appointment of new members, and powers and duties of the board of commissioners (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Capital Area Transit System, to provide for membership, qualifications, procedure for appointment, appointment of new members, and powers and duties of the board of commissioners (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 865, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1185) (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 865, FINAL PASSAGE (#1063) (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 865, SUSPEND THE RULES (#1062) (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 865, QUORUM CALL (#1061) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 865, FINAL PASSAGE (#1059) (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 865, FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-08 Vetoed by the Governor.
2012-06-04 Vetoed by the Governor on June 8, 2012.
2012-05-30 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2012-05-29 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2012-05-29 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2012-05-24 Read by title, roll called, yeas 68, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in.
2012-05-21 Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2012.
2012-05-15 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2012-05-15 The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 15 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2012-05-15 Reconsidered.
2012-05-15 By a vote of 20 yeas and 13 nays.
2012-05-15 Rules suspended
2012-05-15 Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2012-05-15 Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 18 nays.
2012-05-15 Called from the Calendar.
2012-05-01 Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2012-05-01 Rules suspended
2012-04-18 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2012-04-17 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2012-04-16 Reported favorably.
2012-04-11 Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2012-04-10 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 44. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2012-04-04 Scheduled for floor debate on 4/10/2012.
2012-04-03 Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2012-04-02 Reported with amendments (13-3) (Regular).
2012-03-28 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2012-03-27 Read by title.
2012-03-03 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
2012-03-02 Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB865
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=780427
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=786403
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=790592
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=806028
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=790571
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=802005
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=802021
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=802022
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=802025
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=805937

Bill Comments

feedback