LA HB856 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the secretary of state shall be responsible for voting system maintenance and repair (EGF NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides that the secretary of state shall be responsible for voting system maintenance and repair (EGF NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 856 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1568) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 856 FINAL PASSAGE (#1140) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 856 FINAL PASSAGE (#670) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 856 FINAL PASSAGE (#1140) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 856 FINAL PASSAGE (#670) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Reese, and Talbot. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2024-05-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Mike Johnson, Beaullieu, and Emerson. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2024-05-23 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2024. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |