LA HB856 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the purpose of payments made to waste tire processors
Title
Provides for the purpose of payments made to waste tire processors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |