LA HB85 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a literacy program for certain public school students (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a literacy program for certain public school students (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]
Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Paula Davis [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Larry Frieman [R]
Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. John Illg [R]
Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]
Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]
Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Joseph Orgeron [R]Rep. Charles Owen [R]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]
Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Francis Thompson [D]
Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]
Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]
Sen. Joseph Bouie [D]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]
Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Michael Fesi [R]Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]
Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]Sen. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]
Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]Sen. Rick Ward [R]
Sen. Mack White [R]Sen. Glen Womack [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 85 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1090) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 85 CO-AUTHORS (#806) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 85 FINAL PASSAGE (#805) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 85 FINAL PASSAGE (#472) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 415.
2021-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-06SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-02SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-06-02SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2021-06-02SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-19SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-17HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
2021-05-11HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-10HouseReported with amendments (19-0).
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-04-22HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-12HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021.
2021-03-09HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-09HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB85&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1202888
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216733
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222730
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225327
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233318
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235916
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214281
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216625
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216772
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222433
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222669
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223082
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224654
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230410
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230654
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1202889
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212465
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216749
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217008
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222926
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225064
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225423
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225624
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230652
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231100
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232355
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233711
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237942
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225307
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232124
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232125
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233254

Bill Comments

feedback