LA HB845 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to enforcement of unfair sales of motor fuel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to enforcement of unfair sales of motor fuel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 845 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1359) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 845 FINAL PASSAGE (#1313) (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 845 FINAL PASSAGE (#724) (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-17HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/18/18.
2018-05-17HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-17SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 14 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-17SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2018-05-17SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-17SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-17SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2018-05-17SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2018-05-16SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-15SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2018-05-07SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-05-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-04-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
2018-04-30HouseNotice given.
2018-04-30HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18.
2018-04-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-23HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2018-04-03HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB845&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082332
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089086
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093096
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099444
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086333
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089037
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089294
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097350
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098814
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099016
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099228
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082334
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089225
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093169
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097357
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097629
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103625
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107838
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093080
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098830

Bill Comments

feedback