LA HB842 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 52. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 52. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires daily recess for public school students in grades kindergarten through eight
Title
Requires daily recess for public school students in grades kindergarten through eight
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 FINAL PASSAGE (#903) (Y: 44 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 4089 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#902) (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 4088 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#901) (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 4087 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#900) (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 3818 BY AMEDEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#899) (Y: 38 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 3876 BY BOUIE MOTION TO ADOPT (#790) (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 4089 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#902) (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 4088 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#901) (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 4087 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#900) (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 3818 BY AMEDEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#899) (Y: 38 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 842 AMENDMENT # 3876 BY BOUIE MOTION TO ADOPT (#790) (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 52. Failed to pass. |
2018-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. |
2018-05-01 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (8-5-1). |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |