LA HB84 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the authorized uses of inmate labor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the authorized uses of inmate labor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 84 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1222) (Y: 72 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 84 FINAL PASSAGE (#1005) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 84 FINAL PASSAGE (#193) (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 537.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 72, nays 16, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
2018-05-11HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-10SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-09SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/02/18.
2018-03-26HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-22HouseReported favorably (9-3-1).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-02-23HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018.
2018-02-20HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-02-20HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB84&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1065085
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078163
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098338
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102737
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094063
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095834
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098279
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1065097
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078380
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094152
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105451
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081670
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095707

Bill Comments

feedback