LA HB833 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for reduction to revenues into certain statutory funds (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides for reduction to revenues into certain statutory funds (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4232 BY MORRIS JAY MOTION TO ADOPT (#866) (Y: 11 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4266 BY MCFARLAND (#865) (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4251 BY THIBAUT MOTION TO ADOPT (#864) (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4242 BY THIBAUT MOTION TO ADOPT (#863) (Y: 50 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4297 BY HORTON MOTION TO ADOPT (#862) (Y: 55 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4154 BY COUSSAN MOTION TO ADOPT (#861) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4266 BY MCFARLAND (#865) (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4251 BY THIBAUT MOTION TO ADOPT (#864) (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4242 BY THIBAUT MOTION TO ADOPT (#863) (Y: 50 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4297 BY HORTON MOTION TO ADOPT (#862) (Y: 55 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 833 AMENDMENT # 4154 BY COUSSAN MOTION TO ADOPT (#861) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (11-5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |