LA HB833 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-23)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-23)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the ABLE Account savings program for persons with disabilities (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Creates the ABLE Account savings program for persons with disabilities (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 833 FINAL PASSAGE (#615) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 833 CO-AUTHORS (#614) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 833 FINAL PASSAGE (#165) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 833 CO-AUTHORS (#614) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 833 FINAL PASSAGE (#165) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2014-05-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 93. |
2014-05-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014. |
2014-03-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |