LA HB830 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to criminal background checks for owners, employees, volunteers, and inspectors of early learning centers (EN INCREASE FF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to criminal background checks for owners, employees, volunteers, and inspectors of early learning centers (EN INCREASE FF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 830 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1232) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#1118) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#612) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#1118) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#612) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 646. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2016. |
2016-04-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |