LA HB830 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Central Louisiana Regional Port
Title
Creates the Central Louisiana Regional Port
Sponsors
Rep. Lance Harris [R] | Rep. Jeff Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 830 ADOPT (#1051) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 830 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1034) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 830 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#760) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#582) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#311) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 830 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1034) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 830 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#760) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#582) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#311) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 434. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-10 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2015-06-09 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Adley, Gallot, and Long. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Harris, St. Germain, and Hall. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015. |
2015-05-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (9-2). |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title. |