LA HB83 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 01/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 01/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for civil authority prohibited use coverage
Title
Provides for civil authority prohibited use coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 83 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1535) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#1242) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#434) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 83 AMENDMENT # 3148 BY JORDAN MOTION TO ADOPT (#431) (Y: 46 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#1242) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#434) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 83 AMENDMENT # 3148 BY JORDAN MOTION TO ADOPT (#431) (Y: 46 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2023. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 434. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported with amendments (8-4). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-02-18 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. |
2022-02-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-02-15 | House | Prefiled. |