LA HB826 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: 06/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the limitations of liability due to the COVID-19 public health emergency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the limitations of liability due to the COVID-19 public health emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 826 ADOPT (#735) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 826 MOTION TO ADOPT (#769) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 826 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#731) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 826 FINAL PASSAGE (#577) (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 826 FINAL PASSAGE (#397) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13HouseEffective date: 06/13/2020.
2020-06-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 336.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-01HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-01SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Cloud, Peacock, and Fields.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Pressly, Gregory Miller, and Villio.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-15HouseReported with amendments (12-0-1).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB826&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168138
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172692
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175655
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179213
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182532
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172250
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172685
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172742
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173075
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172373
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175366
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175100
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176189
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177275
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178210
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178468
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168139
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172711
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175715
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176347
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178799
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179265
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186297
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175610
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177692
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178902
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179015

Bill Comments

feedback