LA HB823 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the termination date of laws authorizing the recommendation or prescription of medical marijuana in the treatment of certain debilitating medical conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals the termination date of laws authorizing the recommendation or prescription of medical marijuana in the treatment of certain debilitating medical conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 823 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1329) (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 823 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1329) (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 823 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1242) (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 823 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1240) (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 823 FINAL PASSAGE (#953) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 823 FINAL PASSAGE (#503) (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 58, nays 32, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
2018-05-16HouseNotice given.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2018-05-16HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-16HouseMotion to reconsider pending.
2018-05-16HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 52, nays 28, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
2018-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-09SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-07SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-03SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-02SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-18HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/18/18.
2018-04-12HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-11HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-03HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB823&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082072
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085413
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088235
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099109
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088066
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092581
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095203
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098340
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098318
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098942
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099001
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082073
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085712
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088290
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092690
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088190
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095043

Bill Comments

feedback