LA HB820 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to civil forfeiture
Title
Provides relative to civil forfeiture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 820 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1199) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 820 FINAL PASSAGE (#828) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 820 FINAL PASSAGE (#680) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 820 FINAL PASSAGE (#828) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 820 FINAL PASSAGE (#680) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 747. |
2022-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-25 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/26/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2022-03-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-15 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |